Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ilka M. Davila, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by 70 Lincoln St, against Robert A. Gilbert Jr, represented by 174 North Summit Street, Michael Joseph Culkin, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with HON ERIC COLEMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON ERIC COLEMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2021 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-SHORT | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER RESULT: Accepted 11/21/2022 HON BARRY ARMATA | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | WORKSHEET FOR THE CONNECTICUT CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARAGE GUIDELINES CCSG-1 | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 11/21/2022 HON BARRY ARMATA | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY SERVICES NOTICE TO COURT JD-FM-223 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/19/2022 HON BARRY ARMATA | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR REFERRAL BY CSSD FAMILY SERVICES (FORM JD-FM-230) RESULT: Granted 9/19/2022 HON BARRY ARMATA | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
September 16, 2022 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE Def's Post Judgment Motion to Modify Custody |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.