Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cks Prime Investments Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cohen Steven Law Offices Of Llc, against Juan Vargasdelgado, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with Julia L. Aurigemma presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2022 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/4/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: May 09, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/9/2022 HON JULIA AURIGEMMA
Date: May 09, 2022MOTION FOR JUDGMENT RESULT: Granted 5/9/2022 HON JULIA AURIGEMMA
Date: April 25, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Granted 4/4/2022 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 25, 2022SUMMONS
Date: February 15, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: February 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/9/2022 HON JULIA AURIGEMMA | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT WITHOUT TRIAL-GENERAL RESULT: HON JULIA AURIGEMMA | |
May 09, 2022 | Short Calendar SC-10 #006 | ||
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT RESULT: Granted 5/9/2022 HON JULIA AURIGEMMA | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/4/2022 BY THE CLERK | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Granted 4/4/2022 BY THE CLERK | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.