Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by London & London, against Jorge L Sanchez, represented by Fl 1, in the jurisdiction of Hartford County, CT, . Hartford County, CT Superior Courts with Julia L. Aurigemma presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2022 |
CategoryC40 - Contracts - Collections |
Last RefreshedOctober 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHartford County, CT |
Matter TypeCollections |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/22/2022 HON JULIA AURIGEMMA
Date: February 22, 2022MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 2/22/2022 HON JULIA AURIGEMMA
Date: February 08, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2022APPEARANCE
Date: February 04, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2022SUMMONS
Date: January 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/22/2022 HON JULIA AURIGEMMA | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION BEFORE TRIAL COMMENCED RESULT: HON JULIA AURIGEMMA | |
February 22, 2022 | Short Calendar SC-10 #017 | ||
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH STIPULATION RESULT: Granted 2/22/2022 HON JULIA AURIGEMMA | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.