Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Julia Veira Conservator For Rose Spradley, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by Robert Joseph Williams Jr, against Dawn Rugar Aka Dawn Spradley, Richard Spradley, represented by 88 South Water Street, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with Walter M. Spader, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2023 |
CategoryH00 - Housing - Summary Process |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
|
APPEARANCE RICHARD SPRADLEY
Date: May 05, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2023NOTICE TO QUIT POSSESSION - ORIGINAL SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: April 28, 2023HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32)
Date: April 28, 2023ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE RICHARD SPRADLEY
Date: May 05, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: April 28, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE AS TO RICHARD SPRADLEY
Date: May 08, 2023APPEARANCE DAWN RUGAR
Date: May 05, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE AS TO DAWN SPRADLEY AKA DAWN RUGAR
Date: May 08, 2023ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE DAWN RUGAR
Date: May 05, 2023SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED
Date: August 01, 2023STIPULATION RESULT: Accepted 5/30/2023 HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH
Date: May 30, 2023EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION ISSUED SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: August 02, 2023EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION ISSUED SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: August 16, 2023SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED
Date: August 15, 2023SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED UNSATISFIED SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION
Date: August 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE Summary Process Execution for Possession
Date: August 24, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 8/18/2023 HON WALTER SPADER
Date: August 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE Summary Process Execution for Possession | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTION (AUDITA QUERELA) RICHARD SPRADLEY RESULT: Denied 8/18/2023 HON WALTER SPADER | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 8/18/2023 HON WALTER SPADER | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION ISSUED SUMMARY PROCESS | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED UNSATISFIED SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION ISSUED SUMMARY PROCESS | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION RESULT: Accepted 5/30/2023 HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF WITH FINAL STAY BY STIPULATION RESULT: HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.