We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Federal Management Co. Inc. Managing Agent For Cap V. De Los Santos, Teobaldo

Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago

Federal Management Co. Inc. Managing Agent For Capitol Towers Rhf Partners Limited Partnership, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by Flynn Law Group, against Teobaldo De Los Santos, represented by 470 Broad Street, Apt 505, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts HARTFORD HOUSING SESSION.

Case Details for Federal Management Co. Inc. Managing Agent For Capitol Towers Rhf Partners Limited Partnership v. Teobaldo De Los Santos

Filing Date

March 24, 2023

Category

H00 - Housing - Summary Process

Last Refreshed

July 21, 2023

Filing Location

Fairfield County, CT

Filing Court House

HARTFORD HOUSING SESSION

Parties for Federal Management Co. Inc. Managing Agent For Capitol Towers Rhf Partners Limited Partnership v. Teobaldo De Los Santos

Plaintiffs

Federal Management Co. Inc. Managing Agent For Capitol Towers Rhf Partners Limited Partnership

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Flynn Law Group

Defendants

Teobaldo De Los Santos

Attorneys for Defendants

470 Broad Street, Apt 505

Case Events for Federal Management Co. Inc. Managing Agent For Capitol Towers Rhf Partners Limited Partnership v. Teobaldo De Los Santos

Type Description
Docket Event MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT - HOUSING
Docket Event APPEARANCE
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/9/2023 HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH Last Updated: Entry Number - 05/09/2023
Docket Event APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTION (AUDITA QUERELA) RESULT: Granted 5/9/2023 HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH
Docket Event MOTION TO QUASH
Docket Event MOTION FOR WAIVER RESULT: Granted 5/9/2023 HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH
Docket Event EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION ISSUED SUMMARY PROCESS
Docket Event SUMMARY PROCESS EXECUTION FILED
Docket Event NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/17/2023 HON THAMAR ESPERANCE-SMITH
See all events