Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
34 Nicholas Ave filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with HON STANLEY NOVACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2024 |
CategoryF05 - Family - Nonadversarial Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 4/4/2024 HON STANLEY NOVACK | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION RESULT: HON STANLEY NOVACK | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQ FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISS OF MARRIAGE OR LEGAL SEP (FORM JD-FM-281) | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF FINAL AGREEMENT WITHOUT COURT APPEARANCE (FORM JD-FM-282) | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - DISSOLUTION, LEGAL SEPARATION, OR ANNULMENT | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WAIVE STATUTORY TIME PERIOD BY AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES - DIVORCE OR LEGAL SEPARATION | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | |
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | RECORD CORRECTION SEE CORRECTED ORDER RESULT: Order 3/2/2024 HON JENNIFER DECASTRO-TUNNARD Last Updated: Legend Code - 03/20/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.