Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Volodymyr Kryvak, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Unit 703, against Danashley M Rosario, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with HON STANLEY NOVACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2023 |
CategoryF00 - Family - Dissolution Of Marriage - C.G.S. Chapter 815J |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Uncontested Trial | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILE | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION AFTER HEARING UPON DEFAULT RESULT: HON STANLEY NOVACK | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JD-FM-6-SHORT | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ONLINE PUBLICATION OF LEGAL NOTICE AFTER COURT ORDER (FORM JD-CL-161) | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NOTICE | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY ERASED TO CORRECT ERROR Last Updated: Document Moved - 09/21/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.