Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Meredith Maclaine, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Needle & Cuda, Pryor Cashman Llp, against Shane Kenneth Foster, represented by #1201, Posmantier Eric R Llc Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with MICHAEL SHAY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2022 |
CategoryF72 - Family - Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction And Enforcement Act - C.G.S 46B-115 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2024 | Hearing | ||
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST - FAMILY MATTERS (FORM JD-FM-292) RESULT: Granted 2/5/2024 HON JOSEPH VIZCARRONDO | |
August 08, 2023 | Hearing | ||
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 7/6/2023 HON RONALD KOWALSKI | |
June 14, 2023 | Status Conference | ||
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 6/13/2023 HON RONALD KOWALSKI | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
January 30, 2023 | Case Date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.