Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
364 Wells Hope Street Llc, Wells Donuts Llc, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case represented by Cacace Tusch & Santagata, against Donut Delight Group Llc, H&P Llc, Hugo Zambrino, James J Lunney Iii Zoning Enforcement Officer For The City Of Stamford, Larry Perlman, (total of 6) See All represented by Berchem Moses Pc, Stamford Corporation Counsel, Wofsey Rosen Kweskin & Kuriansky Llp, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with John F. Kavanewsky, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2023 |
CategoryA00 - Appeals - Zoning |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeZoning |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This legal document involves a complaint by Plaintiffs 364 Wells Hope Street LLC and Wells Donuts LLC appealing a decision by the Zoning Board of Appeals of the City of Stamford regarding the use of a drive-through window at 364 Hope Street. The Plai...
REPLY MEMORANDUM Reply in Support of Motion to Strike (104.00)
Date: March 21, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/4/2024 HON JOHN KAVANEWSKY
Date: April 04, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 04, 2024MOTION FOR ORDER
Date: February 06, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2023CONTINUATION OF PARTIES
Date: December 08, 2023MOTION TO STRIKE and Memorandum of Law in Support RESULT: Granted 4/15/2024 HON JOHN KAVANEWSKY
Date: February 07, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: December 08, 2023SUMMONS
Date: December 08, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 3/22/2024 BY THE CLERK
Date: March 22, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 4/4/2024 HON JOHN KAVANEWSKY
Date: March 08, 2024AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 02, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 30, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PB 10-40
Date: March 07, 2024CERTIFIED LIST OF PAPERS IN THE RECORD PB 14-7A(b)/14-7B(b) REVISED certified list
Date: March 04, 2024CERTIFIED LIST OF PAPERS IN THE RECORD PB 14-7A(b)/14-7B(b)
Date: February 07, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/15/2024 HON JOHN KAVANEWSKY
Date: April 15, 2024SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: December 18, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 11, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/15/2024 HON JOHN KAVANEWSKY | |
April 15, 2024 | Remote Motion to Strike Hearing | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/4/2024 HON JOHN KAVANEWSKY | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/22/2024 BY THE CLERK | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY MEMORANDUM Reply in Support of Motion to Strike (104.00) | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 4/4/2024 HON JOHN KAVANEWSKY | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PB 10-40 | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED LIST OF PAPERS IN THE RECORD PB 14-7A(b)/14-7B(b) REVISED certified list | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE and Memorandum of Law in Support RESULT: Granted 4/15/2024 HON JOHN KAVANEWSKY | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED LIST OF PAPERS IN THE RECORD PB 14-7A(b)/14-7B(b) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.