Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Jose Rivera, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Attorney Rachel M Baird, Law Offices Of David V Derosa, against Nicholas Kakaletris, Siamand Soufizadeh, represented by Richard John Rapice, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Taggart D. Adams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2023 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint involves a dispute between the plaintiff, Jose Rivera, and the defendants, Nicholas Kakaletris and Siamand Soufizadeh. Rivera and Kakaletris were previously in a domestic partnership and jointly purchased a property in Connecticut. Kak...
AMENDMENT Plaintiff's Amended Application for Prejudgment Remedy
Date: June 14, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/30/2024 HON TAGGART ADAMS
Date: January 30, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: November 21, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 4/17/2024 HON ROBERT GOLGER
Date: April 17, 2024PRE-SERVICE ORDER FOR HEARING AND NOTICE
Date: January 18, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD
Date: December 19, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/8/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 08, 2023OBJECTION TO REQUEST TO REVISE RESULT: Overruled 4/17/2024 HON ROBERT GOLGER
Date: April 01, 2024MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Denied 2/14/2024 BY THE CLERK
Date: February 02, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/25/2024 HON ROBERT GOLGER
Date: March 25, 2024APPEARANCE
Date: December 04, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 2/14/2024 BY THE CLERK
Date: February 14, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 16, 2024MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF ASSETS
Date: January 26, 2024ORDER RESULT: Overruled 4/17/2024 HON ROBERT GOLGER
Date: April 17, 2024REPLY Reply to Plaintiff's Objection to Request to Revise
Date: April 10, 2024WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Withdrawal of Plaintiff's March 28, 2024 Request to Revise
Date: April 01, 2024SUMMONS
Date: November 21, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Order 4/17/2024 HON ROBERT GOLGER
Date: April 01, 2024MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Denied 12/8/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 01, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE Return of Service RE: Plaintiff's Request for Prejudgment Remedy
Date: February 02, 2024REQUEST TO REVISE
Date: February 07, 2024REPLY Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's "Request to Revise the Request to Revise"
Date: March 28, 2024REQUEST TO REVISE Plaintiff's Request to Revise
Date: March 28, 2024REVISED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Revised Complaint
Date: May 03, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 3/25/2024 HON ROBERT GOLGER
Date: March 07, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR PREJUDGMENT REMEDY / HEARING (JD-CV-53)
Date: January 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF ASSETS Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Disclosure of Assets | |
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT Amended Application for Prejudgment Remedy - Schedule of Proposed Garnishees | |
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT Plaintiff's Amended Application for Prejudgment Remedy | |
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff's Amended Affidavit in Support of Application for Prejudgment Remedy | |
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO AMEND COMPLAINT/AMENDMENT Request for Leave to Amend Revised Complaint | |
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | REVISED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Revised Complaint | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 4/17/2024 HON ROBERT GOLGER | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Overruled 4/17/2024 HON ROBERT GOLGER | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY Reply to Plaintiff's Objection to Request to Revise |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.