We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Roca, Mary V. Garcia, Alba

Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago

Mary Roca, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Philip E Berns, Wesley Mark Malowitz, against Alba Garcia, represented by Marshall Dennehey, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Sheila A. Ozalis presiding.

Case Details for Mary Roca v. Alba Garcia

Judge

Sheila A. Ozalis

Filing Date

October 18, 2022

Category

T03 - Torts - Defective Premises - Private - Other

Last Refreshed

May 24, 2024

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

Fairfield County, CT

Matter Type

Premises Liability

Filing Court House

Superior

Parties for Mary Roca v. Alba Garcia

Plaintiffs

Mary Roca

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Philip E Berns

Wesley Mark Malowitz

Defendants

Alba Garcia

Attorneys for Defendants

Marshall Dennehey

Case Documents for Mary Roca v. Alba Garcia

CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6

Date: October 31, 2022

APPEARANCE Appearance

Date: October 31, 2022

ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE

Date: March 03, 2023

REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE

Date: March 07, 2023

SUMMONS

Date: October 18, 2022

COMPLAINT

Date: October 18, 2022

APPEARANCE Appearance

Date: October 19, 2022

RETURN OF SERVICE

Date: October 18, 2022

Case Events for Mary Roca v. Alba Garcia

Type Description
Jury Selection / Trial
Pretrial Conference
Remote Trial Management Conference
Jury Selection / Trial
Jury Selection / Trial
Pretrial Conference
Remote Trial Management Conference
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Order 5/2/2024 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Order 5/1/2024 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Docket Event MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Order 5/1/2024 HON SHEILA OZALIS
See all events