We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Crown Asset Management, Llc V. Gaskin, Bernadette

Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago

Crown Asset Management, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stillman Law Office, against Bernadette Gaskin, represented by 14 Adamson Av 2, Matthew Leo Gustaitis, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts .

Case Details for Crown Asset Management, Llc v. Bernadette Gaskin

Filing Date

September 16, 2022

Category

S15 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Collection - Purchase Debt

Last Refreshed

July 21, 2023

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

Fairfield County, CT

Matter Type

Collections

Parties for Crown Asset Management, Llc v. Bernadette Gaskin

Plaintiffs

Crown Asset Management, Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Stillman Law Office

Defendants

Bernadette Gaskin

Attorneys for Defendants

14 Adamson Av 2

Matthew Leo Gustaitis

Case Documents for Crown Asset Management, Llc v. Bernadette Gaskin

AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS

Date: September 16, 2022

EXHIBITS

Date: September 16, 2022

MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

Date: September 16, 2022

ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS

Date: October 07, 2022

AMENDED RETURN

Date: October 03, 2022

WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION

Date: October 28, 2022

APPEARANCE Appearance

Date: October 07, 2022

Case Events for Crown Asset Management, Llc v. Bernadette Gaskin

Type Description
Remote Court Trial
Remote Settlement Conference
Docket Event WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Docket Event ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS
Docket Event APPEARANCE Appearance
Docket Event AMENDED RETURN
Docket Event SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Docket Event SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Docket Event AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT - SMALL CLAIMS
Docket Event EXHIBITS
See all events