We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Peters,Margaret V. Cardinal Van Lines Llc Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago

Margaret Peters, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Apt 108, against Cardinal Van Lines Llc, Usa Logistics Inc, represented by 11732 Roscoe Blvd #8, Ste 406, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts .

Case Details for Margaret Peters v. Cardinal Van Lines Llc , et al.

Filing Date

February 22, 2022

Category

S25 - Small Claims - Small Claims - Contract - Other

Last Refreshed

July 21, 2023

Practice Area

Commercial

Filing Location

Fairfield County, CT

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Parties for Margaret Peters v. Cardinal Van Lines Llc , et al.

Plaintiffs

Margaret Peters

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Apt 108

Defendants

Cardinal Van Lines Llc

Usa Logistics Inc

Attorneys for Defendants

11732 Roscoe Blvd #8

Ste 406

Case Events for Margaret Peters v. Cardinal Van Lines Llc , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Order 8/16/2022 DIANE BELTZ-JACOBSON, MAG
Remote Hearing
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Order 6/20/2022 DIANE BELTZ-JACOBSON, MAG
Docket Event MOTION TO REARGUE/RECONSIDER - SMALL CLAIMS
Docket Event RETURN OF SERVICE - SMALL CLAIMS
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Order 6/3/2022 SUSAN MONKS, MAG
Docket Event JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL RESULT: SUSAN MONKS, MAG
Docket Event RETURN OF NOTICE
Docket Event AMENDED COMPLAINT - SMALL CLAIMS
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Order 4/25/2022 DIANE BELTZ-JACOBSON, MAG
See all events