Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Peter Lauridsen, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Moore O'Brien & Foti, against Arthur Turovets, D.C., Behzad Hakakian, D.C., Broad Street Wellness Center, P.C., Kirsten Reineke, Njdiet Professional Corporation, (total of 7) See All represented by Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan Llp, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Sheila A. Ozalis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryT28 - Torts - Malpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Peter Lauridsen against Arthur Turovets, D.C., Behzad Hakakian, D.C., Kirsten Reineke, NJDiet Professional Corporation, Nuvo Health & Wellness of CT, Inc., Nuvo Health & Wellness Co., and Broad Street Welln...
CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Order 2/26/2024 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: February 26, 2024LIST OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF THE LIVE TESTIMONY OF AN EXPERT WITNESS
Date: November 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: October 02, 2023MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Joint Motion for Continuance of In-Person Pretrial
Date: February 22, 2024LIST OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF THE LIVE TESTIMONY OF AN EXPERT WITNESS
Date: December 06, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Joint Motion for Continuance of Remote Trial Management Conference
Date: February 22, 2024CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: October 02, 2023DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: December 01, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 2/23/2024 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: February 23, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 8/17/2023 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: August 17, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 8/16/2023 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: August 16, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 2/26/2024 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: February 26, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 2/29/2024 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: February 29, 2024ANSWER
Date: October 20, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 3/11/2024 HON SHEILA OZALIS
Date: March 11, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 8/2/2023 HON ROBERT GENUARIO
Date: August 02, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/3/2021 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: August 27, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 Behzad Hakakian, D.C.
Date: May 10, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Order 9/3/2021 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE Defendant Arthur Turovets, D.C., Notice of Compliance with Plaintiff's IRPs
Date: September 21, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/6/2021 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: July 06, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/2/2021 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: August 02, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: March 11, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT AMENDED COMPLAINT AS OF RIGHT PURSUANT TO P.B. § 10-59
Date: April 22, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN
Date: April 29, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/12/2021 HON MARY SOMMER
Date: April 12, 2021NOTICE
Date: April 23, 2021ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: March 11, 2021NOTICE Defendants' Notice of Service of Non-Standard IRPs to Plaintiff
Date: August 04, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/7/2021 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: September 07, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 25, 2021WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION AGAINST PARTICULAR DEFENDANT(S) – CASE REMAINS PENDING
Date: April 21, 2021SUMMONS
Date: March 11, 2021ORDER RESULT: Accepted 9/3/2021 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/7/2021 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: June 07, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 9/3/2021 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/9/2021 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: August 09, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/4/2021 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
August 13, 2024 | Pretrial Conference | ||
August 07, 2024 | Remote Trial Management Conference | ||
March 26, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 19, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/11/2024 HON SHEILA OZALIS | |
March 11, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-13 #003 | ||
March 07, 2024 | Pretrial Conference | ||
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 2/29/2024 HON SHEILA OZALIS | |
February 28, 2024 | Remote Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.