Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dr. Robert D Cottle, filed a(n) T40 - Torts - Assault And Battery case represented by Zeldes Needle & Cooper, against Adaobi N Kurylov, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with Alex V. Hernandez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryT40 - Torts - Assault And Battery |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
|
APPLICATION Application and Writ Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum
Date: January 09, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: July 30, 2018MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 1/14/2019 HON MARY SOMMER
Date: January 11, 2019MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 12/10/2018 HON MARY SOMMER
Date: December 04, 2018ORDER RESULT: Rejected 7/17/2019 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 17, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/10/2018 HON MARY SOMMER
Date: December 10, 2018ORDER RESULT: Order 2/21/2019 HON ALEX HERNANDEZ
Date: February 21, 2019ORDER RESULT: Denied 9/14/2018 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 14, 2018MOTION FOR JUDGMENT RESULT: Order 2/21/2019 HON ALEX HERNANDEZ
Date: February 20, 2019WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Withdrawal of Motion 103.00
Date: September 18, 2018ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/14/2019 HON MARY SOMMER
Date: January 14, 2019ORDER RESULT: Rejected 7/22/2019 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 22, 2019WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Withdrawal of motion 102
Date: September 18, 2018CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Order 2/20/2019 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: February 19, 2019ORDER RESULT: Order 2/20/2019 HON KENNETH POVODATOR
Date: February 20, 2019ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/25/2018 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 25, 2018SUMMONS
Date: July 30, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Denied 9/14/2018 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 07, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20 RESULT: Granted 9/25/2018 BY THE CLERK
Date: September 18, 2018CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: November 21, 2018MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 19, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: September 18, 2018AMENDED WRIT AND SUMMONS
Date: September 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 20, 2019EXECUTION REFILED AS CORRECTED - NO FEE RESULT: Rejected 7/22/2019 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Rejected 7/22/2019 BY THE CLERK | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | EXECUTION REFILED AS CORRECTED - NO FEE RESULT: Rejected 7/22/2019 BY THE CLERK | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Rejected 7/17/2019 BY THE CLERK | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR EXECUTION FINANCIAL INSTITUTION-DEBTOR IS A NATURAL PERSON (JD-CV-24) RESULT: Rejected 7/17/2019 BY THE CLERK | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 2/21/2019 HON ALEX HERNANDEZ | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AFTER COMPLETED TRIAL TO THE COURT - HEARING IN DAMAGES RESULT: HON ALEX HERNANDEZ | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDGMENT RESULT: Order 2/21/2019 HON ALEX HERNANDEZ | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 2/20/2019 HON KENNETH POVODATOR | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Order 2/20/2019 HON KENNETH POVODATOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.