Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Ruben Parra, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Happy Even After Family Law, against Jessica Gonzalez, represented by Zingaro & Cretella Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Ronald E. Kowalski, II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2024 |
CategoryF71 - Family - Visitation Petition/Application - C.G.S. 46B-59/46B-61 |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2025 | Trial | ||
February 10, 2025 | Trial | ||
February 03, 2025 | Remote Status Conference | ||
January 09, 2025 | Pretrial Conference | ||
April 24, 2024 | Case Date | ||
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/23/2024 HON RONALD KOWALSKI | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST - FAMILY MATTERS (FORM JD-FM-292) RESULT: Granted 4/23/2024 HON RONALD KOWALSKI | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE Plaintiff's request for mandatory disclosure and production | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE Defendant's Notice of Serving Request for Mandatory Disclosure and Production | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.