Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Gracelyan Cruz Cruz Aka Gracelyan Cruz, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by 511 Brooks Street, against Daniel Snatos, represented by 71 Goodwill Avenue, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with Peter A. McShane presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2023 |
CategoryF80 - Family - Parentage Petition - C.G.S. 46B-160 |
Last RefreshedMay 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2023 | Magistrate Hearing (FA) - Parentage | ||
June 14, 2023 | Magistrate Hearing (FA) - Parentage | ||
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER - FAMILY SUPPORT MAGISTRATE - JD-FM-170 RESULT: Order 5/3/2023 HON PETER MCSHANE | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR GENETIC TEST RESULT: Granted 5/3/2023 HON PETER MCSHANE | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT Custodial Parent | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | WORKSHEET FOR THE CONNECTICUT CHILD SUPPORT AND ARREARAGE GUIDELINES CCSG-1 | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | PARENTAGE PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.