Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joseph Knox, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by 47 Broadway, 891 Noble Ave, against Catherine Davis, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with Margarita Hartley Moore presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 2023 |
CategoryF40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2023 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT ESTABLISHING LEGAL RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN PARENTS AND CHILD(REN) IN CUST/VIS ACTION PA 18-75 | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE abode | |
September 11, 2023 | Hearing | ||
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE certified | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Continuance 8/28/2023 HON MARGARITA HARTLEY MOORE | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR NONDISCLOSURE OF LOCATION INFORMATION JD-FM-188/JD-CV-163 | |
August 28, 2023 | Hearing | ||
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT SEALED RESULT: Denied 8/14/2023 HON THOMAS O NEILL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.