Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Phabio Basquiat, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Karayiannis & Denkovich Pc, against Aime Bien Garcia A K A Garcia Bien Aime A K A Aime Garcia Bien, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Halloran & Sage Llp, Meehan Di Palma Roberts & Turret Law Off, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with Barry K. Stevens presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2023 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
The legal document involves a complaint filed by Phabio Basquiat against Aime Bien Garcia and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. It details a car accident on December 25, 2022, in Stamford, Connecticut, where Aime Garcia rear-ended Phabi...
NOTICE Notice of Service of Interrogatories & Production on Defendant, AIME BIEN GARCIA
Date: December 12, 2023CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: January 18, 2024CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: January 26, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 07, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 1/1/2024 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: December 12, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: December 04, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: January 19, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2023NOTICE Notice of Service of Interrogatories & Production on Defendant, State Farm
Date: December 12, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 16, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: January 24, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE of Service of D&P upon co-defendant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance
Date: January 16, 2024SUMMONS
Date: December 04, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/19/2024 HON JOHN RILEY
Date: February 19, 2024ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: January 18, 2024NOTICE Notice of Service of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE of Service of D&P upon the Plaintiff
Date: January 16, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/1/2024 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: January 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-12 #002 | ||
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/19/2024 HON JOHN RILEY | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13 RESULT: Granted 2/19/2024 HON JOHN RILEY | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6 | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE of Service of D&P upon co-defendant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.