Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Power Unlimited, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michelson Kane P.C., against Canfield Partners, Llc, Live Oak Contracting, Llc, represented by Gordon & Rees Llp, Robinson & Cole Llp, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Barry K. Stevens presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2023 |
CategoryC00 - Contracts - Construction - All Other |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This legal document involves a breach of contract between Power Unlimited, Inc. and Live Oak Contracting, LLC, as well as Canfield Partners, LLC, regarding electrical contracting services for the construction of Canfield Park in Bridgeport, Connectic...
APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 19, 2023APPLICATION FOR PREJUDGMENT REMEDY RESULT: Order 3/1/2024 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: February 14, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/3/2024 HON MARK GOULD
Date: April 03, 2024REVISED COMPLAINT Second Revised Complaint
Date: April 01, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13
Date: April 05, 2024REPLY MEMORANDUM In further support of Motion to Strike (#104.00)
Date: March 18, 2024REVISED COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2024MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF ASSETS
Date: February 20, 2024MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION By Canfield
Date: February 08, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PB 10-40 By Canfield
Date: February 08, 2024ORDER RESULT: Off 3/25/2024 HON MARK GOULD
Date: March 25, 2024OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 11, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 04, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE of PJR on Live Oak
Date: February 29, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 3/1/2024 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: March 01, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/25/2024 HON MARK GOULD
Date: March 25, 2024MOTION TO STRIKE BY CANFIELD RESULT: Off 3/25/2024 HON MARK GOULD
Date: February 08, 2024SUMMONS
Date: December 04, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 15, 2023REQUEST TO REVISE Live Oak Contracting, LLC's Request to Revise
Date: January 08, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: December 04, 2023REQUEST TO REVISE Canfield Request to Revise
Date: January 08, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 4/8/2024 HON BARRY STEVENS
Date: April 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2024 | Trial | ||
November 14, 2024 | Pretrial Conference | ||
June 14, 2024 | Hearing | ||
April 09, 2024 | Remote Status Conference | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 4/8/2024 HON BARRY STEVENS | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13 | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/3/2024 HON MARK GOULD | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) requesting that remote hearing scheduled for 4/8/24 be marked OFF RESULT: Granted 4/3/2024 HON MARK GOULD | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | REVISED COMPLAINT Second Revised Complaint | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Off 3/25/2024 HON MARK GOULD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.