Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Arc Home, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brock And Scott Pllc, against Audio Video Environments, Llc, James K. Young, Marialda Young A K A Marialda Salazar Curty, Property Management & Associates, represented by 141 Toll House Lane, 60 Rustown Drive, Fl 2, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with John A. Cirello presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2023 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
APPRAISAL
Date: October 26, 2023ORDER GR: D-02, D-03, D-04 RESULT: Granted 7/28/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 28, 2023OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: February 29, 2024MOTION FOR JUDGMENT-STRICT FORECLOSURE
Date: September 19, 2023CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 3/15/2024 HON JOHN CIRELLO
Date: March 15, 2024NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH EMAP
Date: October 11, 2023MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT RESULT: Denied 3/15/2024 HON JOHN CIRELLO
Date: March 15, 2024NOTICE Notice of Deposit
Date: March 18, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/15/2024 HON JOHN CIRELLO
Date: March 15, 2024ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/15/2024 HON JOHN CIRELLO
Date: March 15, 2024AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: October 26, 2023MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 26, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD
Date: July 21, 2023SUMMONS
Date: May 04, 2023PRELIMINARY STATEMENT OF DEBT
Date: September 28, 2023NOTICE
Date: June 22, 2023FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: October 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: October 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2023APPEARANCE
Date: June 22, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: May 04, 2023APPEARANCE
Date: April 01, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: November 20, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: July 21, 2023ORDER GR: D-01 RESULT: Granted 7/28/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: July 28, 2023APPEARANCE
Date: March 15, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 4/9/2024 HON JOHN CIRELLO
Date: April 09, 2024OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: October 26, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 11/6/2023 HON JOHN CIRELLO
Date: November 06, 2023MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT
Date: April 03, 2024OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Defendant's Motions to Open
Date: April 17, 2024ORDER RESULT: Off 4/29/2024 HON JOHN CIRELLO
Date: April 29, 2024BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5
Date: March 26, 2024MOTION TO OPEN AND VACATE JUDGMENT RESULT: Off 4/29/2024 HON JOHN CIRELLO
Date: April 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-02 #043 | ||
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Off 4/29/2024 HON JOHN CIRELLO | |
April 29, 2024 | Remote Hearing | ||
April 29, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-02 #042 | ||
April 22, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-02 #064 | ||
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Defendant's Motions to Open | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 4/9/2024 HON JOHN CIRELLO | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO OPEN AND VACATE JUDGMENT RESULT: Off 4/29/2024 HON JOHN CIRELLO | |
April 08, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-02 #055 | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.