We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Ortiz, Migdalia V. Smith, Samuel L.

Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago

Migdalia Ortiz, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Thomas Anthony Virgulto, against Samuel L. Smith, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior.

Case Details for Migdalia Ortiz v. Samuel L. Smith

Filing Date

March 13, 2023

Category

T02 - Torts - Defective Premises - Private - Snow Or Ice

Last Refreshed

May 18, 2024

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

Fairfield County, CT

Matter Type

Premises Liability

Filing Court House

Superior

Parties for Migdalia Ortiz v. Samuel L. Smith

Plaintiffs

Migdalia Ortiz

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Thomas Anthony Virgulto

Defendants

Samuel L. Smith

Case Events for Migdalia Ortiz v. Samuel L. Smith

Type Description
Jury Selection / Trial
Pretrial Conference
Remote Hearing
Docket Event ORDER RESULT: Order 5/14/2024 BY THE CLERK
Remote Pretrial Conference
Remote Hearing
Docket Event ORDER Order for Remote Hearing and Notice RESULT: Order 10/10/2023 BY THE COURT Last Updated: Entry Number - 05/14/2024
Docket Event ORDER Order for Remote Hearing and Notice RESULT: Order 10/10/2023 BY THE COURT
Docket Event SCHEDULING ORDER BY AGREEMENT C50,T02,T03,T11,T12,T61,V01,V04, V09 CASES
Docket Event MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE RESULT: Order 5/14/2024 BY THE CLERK
See all events