Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Lucille Munsell, filed a(n) T20 - Torts - Products Liability - Other Than Vehicular case represented by Early Lucarelli Sweeney & Meisenkothen L, against Gte Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Llc, Rogers Corporation, Special Electric Company, (total of 7) See All represented by Anthony Joseph Sbarra Jr, Brad Warren Graham, Carlie Shane Seigal, Cummings & Lockwood Llc, Holly M Polglase, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Barbara N. Bellis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2022 |
CategoryT20 - Torts - Products Liability - Other Than Vehicular |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Lucille Munsell, the Executrix of the Estate of Stephen Munsell, and Lucille Munsell individually as the surviving spouse. The complaint is against multiple defendants, including Rogers Corporation, Union Carbide Corporatio...
ORDER RESULT: Order 10/6/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: October 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 8/18/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: August 18, 2023MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE
Date: April 20, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT Revised Amended Complaint with underline edits
Date: November 02, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 4/26/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: April 26, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT Revised Amended Complaint
Date: November 02, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/11/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: August 11, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/13/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 6/28/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: June 28, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/14/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: September 14, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/26/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: April 26, 2023DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Pl Expert Witness List
Date: December 16, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Mine Safety Appliances' Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: February 10, 2023OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Rogers motion to strike
Date: May 09, 2022ORDER Copy Email to RJD RESULT: Order 7/22/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: July 22, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 7/22/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: July 22, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Request for status conference with Judge Bellis
Date: November 13, 2023MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR TRIAL
Date: January 22, 2024REPLY to PL OBJ to Seco's MTD
Date: May 31, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/3/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: June 03, 2023MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 9/14/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: September 11, 2023NOTICE Notice of Change of Firm
Date: February 10, 2023DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Rogers Corporation's Expert Witness List
Date: February 10, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 6/21/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: June 21, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Date: February 10, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER Revised Scheduling Order RESULT: Order 4/26/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: April 26, 2023LIST OF WITNESSES Lay Witness List
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBITS #112/113 - exh o-p (MTD MOL)
Date: April 29, 2022LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a) Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Date: April 12, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 12, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Date: April 12, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE return of service
Date: April 05, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER Scheduling Order RESULT: Order 4/28/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: April 21, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 05, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 01, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2022ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC
Date: April 25, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 18, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 07, 2022SUMMONS
Date: March 22, 2022ADDITIONAL PARTIES PAGE
Date: March 22, 2022LIST OF WITNESSES Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Date: April 12, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE return of service
Date: April 07, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/16/2023 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: March 16, 2023ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Date: April 12, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 22, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 28, 2022ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: April 05, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: April 14, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 4/28/2022 HON BARBARA BELLIS
Date: April 28, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) Caseflow Request for Rogers Corporation
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBITS #112 exh j-n (MTD MOL)
Date: April 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2025 | Evidence | ||
January 07, 2025 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION AGAINST PARTICULAR DEFENDANT(S) – CASE REMAINS PENDING Strathmore | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY Plaintiff's Reply to Rogers Corporation's Objection to Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION Rogers Corporation's Amended Objection to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION Defendant Rogers Corporations Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial | |
February 06, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
February 06, 2024 | Remote Status Conference | ||
February 05, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-10 #037 | ||
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.