Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Audrey Lawrence Rosenberg, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by 9 Bauer Pl., against Rachel Katzman, represented by 9 Bauer Pl, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with Tracy Lee Dayton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2020 |
CategoryS90 - Small Claims - Small Claims - All Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
LETTER
Date: August 12, 2020LETTER
Date: July 20, 2020SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40
Date: July 13, 2020SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2020EXHIBITS
Date: July 13, 2020ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS
Date: July 20, 2020ORDER RESULT: Order 4/24/2021 HON TRACY DAYTON
Date: April 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 4/24/2021 HON TRACY DAYTON | |
April 24, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AFTER COMPLETED TRIAL TO THE COURT FOR THE DEFENDANT(S) RESULT: HON TRACY DAYTON | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER - SMALL CLAIMS | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS WRIT AND NOTICE OF SUIT, JD-CV-40 | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS RETURN / STATEMENT OF SERVICE | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.