Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Mariana De Jesus Naula, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by 54 South St., against Carlos Freddy Clauijo Nivicela, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Heidi G. Winslow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2024 |
CategoryF40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 |
Last RefreshedMay 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2024 | Case Date | ||
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER - FAMILY MATTERS RESULT: Order 4/9/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF RESOLUTION SCREENING (FORM JD-FM-290) | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NOTICE | |
April 05, 2024 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER HEARING AND NOTICE | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NOTICE | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT CONCERNING CHILDREN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.