Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Ana A. Cortes Castillo, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by 63 East Lake Rd., against Fidel Antonio Castro Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Heidi G. Winslow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2024 |
CategoryF40 - Family - Custody Application - C.G.S. 46B-61 |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2024 | Resolution Plan Date | ||
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL UNDER PB 14-3 NOTICES SENT - COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL ONLY RESULT: HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/14/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NOTICE | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER HEARING AND NOTICE | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC COURT ORDERS (JD-FM-158) | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT CONCERNING CHILDREN | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER HEARING AND NOTICE | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | CUSTODY APPLICATION | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.