Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Ridgefield Housing Authority, Lp, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by Chesson & Schweickert Llc, against Isette Brendza, represented by Unit E2, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Heidi G. Winslow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2024 |
CategoryH00 - Housing - Summary Process |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This is a legal complaint filed by Ridgefield Housing Authority, LP against Isette Brendza. The complaint consists of multiple counts alleging violations of the lease agreement and Connecticut General Statutes. The counts include failure to maintain ...
REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: March 07, 2024ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: February 29, 2024ORDER RESULT: Order 3/22/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: March 22, 2024APPEARANCE
Date: February 23, 2024AGREEMENT Lease
Date: March 07, 2024NOTICE
Date: March 22, 2024AFFIDAVIT CARES Act Affidavit of Compliance
Date: February 22, 2024HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32)
Date: February 21, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE Writ, Summons and Complaint Marshal Return
Date: February 27, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2024ORDER Hearing Scheduled RESULT: Order 3/7/2024 BY THE COURT
Date: March 07, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: February 21, 2024NOTICE TO QUIT POSSESSION - ORIGINAL SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: February 21, 2024STIPULATION RESULT: Order 3/22/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: March 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 3/22/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | STIPULATION RESULT: Order 3/22/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF WITH NON-FINAL STAY BY STIPULATION RESULT: HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
March 22, 2024 | Trial | ||
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT Lease | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER Hearing Scheduled RESULT: Order 3/7/2024 BY THE COURT | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE Writ, Summons and Complaint Marshal Return |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.