Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Douglas Goetz, Ildiko Goetz, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by Randolph T Lovallo, against Charles Marino, Danbury Autowerks, Llc, James Marino, Jennie Marino, represented by Smart Law Group Pc, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Heidi G. Winslow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2023 |
CategoryH00 - Housing - Summary Process |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a summary process eviction complaint for nonpayment of rent in the State of Connecticut. The plaintiff, Douglas Goetz and Ildiko Goetz, entered into a lease agreement with the defendant, Danbury Autowerks, LLC, Charles Marino, Jenni...
ORDER RESULT: Order 12/21/2023 BY THE COURT
Date: December 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/25/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: January 25, 2024ORDER RESULT: Continuance 1/12/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: January 12, 2024CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: December 21, 2023NOTICE TO QUIT POSSESSION - ORIGINAL SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: November 16, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/21/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: March 21, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/6/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: March 06, 2024EXHIBITS Exhibit A - Lease
Date: November 20, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 1/10/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: January 10, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: December 07, 2023ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: December 15, 2023CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 2/21/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: February 20, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 3/6/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: March 06, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/7/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: February 07, 2024ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/21/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: February 21, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: November 16, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/18/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: April 18, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2023HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32)
Date: November 16, 2023CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 4/18/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: April 18, 2024WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION
Date: December 12, 2023CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 2/7/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: February 07, 2024ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/18/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 18, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 12/12/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: December 12, 2023CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 3/21/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: March 20, 2024CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 1/25/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW
Date: January 24, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2024 | Trial | ||
April 19, 2024 | Trial | ||
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/18/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 4/18/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
March 22, 2024 | Trial | ||
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/21/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 3/21/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
March 08, 2024 | Trial | ||
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/6/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 3/6/2024 HON HEIDI WINSLOW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.