Case Last Refreshed: 19 hours ago
Jennifer French, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gould Law Group Llc, against Lm General Insurance Company, represented by Howd & Ludorf Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Maximino Medina, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2023 |
CategoryV01 - Vehicular - Motor Vehicles - Driver And/Or Passenger(S) Vs. Driver(S) |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
OBJECTION to deft's motion to bifurcate (#110)
Date: May 23, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: April 20, 2023WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION
Date: September 07, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: February 21, 2023CLAIM FOR JURY OF 6
Date: April 13, 2023NOTICE Defendant's Notice of Serving Interrogatories and Requests for Production
Date: April 13, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 4/17/2023 BY THE CLERK
Date: April 17, 2023MOTION FOR ARBITRATION RESULT: Denied 5/8/2023 HON MAXIMINO MEDINA
Date: April 20, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2023NOTICE Notice of Service to Defendant
Date: April 10, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: April 20, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD
Date: April 10, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 7/25/2023 HON MAXIMINO MEDINA
Date: July 25, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/21/2023 HON MAXIMINO MEDINA
Date: June 21, 2023SUMMONS
Date: February 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Denied 5/8/2023 HON MAXIMINO MEDINA
Date: May 08, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13
Date: July 11, 2023APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: February 21, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 5/5/2023 HON MAXIMINO MEDINA
Date: May 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2024 | Jury Selection / Trial | ||
May 02, 2024 | Pretrial Conference | ||
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION RESULT: BY THE PLAINTIFF | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 7/25/2023 HON MAXIMINO MEDINA | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13 | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/21/2023 HON MAXIMINO MEDINA | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY MOTION OR REQUEST PB CH13 re 102.00 RESULT: Granted 6/21/2023 HON MAXIMINO MEDINA | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER remote hearing 6/6/23 9:30 a.m. RESULT: Order 5/24/2023 HON MAXIMINO MEDINA | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | OBJECTION to deft's motion to bifurcate (#110) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.