Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Maria Almeida, filed a(n) H00 - Housing - Summary Process case represented by 2Nd Floor, against Ehab Abouel Kheir, Jane Doe, John Doe, Lis Scocozza, represented by Fl 3, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County, CT, . Fairfield County, CT Superior Courts with John A. Cirello presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2023 |
CategoryH00 - Housing - Summary Process |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, CT |
|
This complaint is a Summary Process (Eviction) Complaint for nonpayment of rent in the State of Connecticut. The plaintiff (landlord) is seeking immediate possession of the premises due to the defendant (tenant) not paying rent as agreed in the lease...
APPEARANCE E Abouelkheir
Date: November 27, 2023APPEARANCE L Scocozza
Date: November 27, 2023ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE E Abouelkheir
Date: November 27, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/22/2023 HON JOHN CIRELLO
Date: December 22, 2023REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: December 06, 2023ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE L Scocozza
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES
Date: December 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 06, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 12/22/2023 HON JOHN CIRELLO
Date: December 22, 2023HOUSING SUMMARY PROCESS SUMMONS (JD-HM-32)
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE TO QUIT POSSESSION - ORIGINAL SUMMARY PROCESS
Date: November 22, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2023AGREEMENT lease
Date: November 22, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: November 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/22/2023 HON JOHN CIRELLO | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO REARGUE/RECONSIDER Motion to Reconsider/Reargue Last Updated: Entry Number - 12/22/2023 | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 12/22/2023 HON JOHN CIRELLO | |
December 22, 2023 | Trial | ||
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION - WHERE ONE ORIGINALLY HAD THE RIGHT OR PRIVILEGE IS NOW TERMINATED RESULT: HON JOHN CIRELLO | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION SUMMARY PROCESS RESULT: Granted 12/22/2023 HON JOHN CIRELLO | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE E Abouelkheir |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.