Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vista Mesa Assisted Living Residence, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by R Thomas Geyer, against All Unknown Persons Who Claim Interest, Christopher Vinger, Diane Hurt, Duane Dawson, Heirs Of George Vinger, (total of 9) See All represented by N A, in the jurisdiction of Dolores County, CO, . Dolores County, CO Superior Courts with William Young Furse presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2023 |
CategoryRule 105 Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDolores County, CO |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Order(Related Document)
Date: August 17, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: August 31, 2023Report(Related Document)
Date: August 31, 2023Summons
Date: September 19, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: September 27, 2023Summons
Date: September 19, 2023Return of Service
Date: October 16, 2023Summons
Date: September 19, 2023Summons
Date: September 19, 2023Report
Date: September 27, 2023Return of Service
Date: October 16, 2023Summons
Date: October 11, 2023Return of Service
Date: October 16, 2023Return of Service
Date: October 16, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: September 28, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: November 13, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: October 26, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: October 25, 2023Report
Date: October 25, 2023Report
Date: November 15, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: November 15, 2023Order(Related Document)
Date: November 16, 2023Motion
Date: November 13, 2023Summons
Date: November 28, 2023Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: November 15, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 18, 2023Complaint(Related Document)
Date: May 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons (Quiet Title) By Publication - Cortez Journal | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: Order on Status Report |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report Status Report |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Order Regarding Service by Publication |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order on Status Report |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order Regarding Service by Publication |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Verified Motion for Service by Publication |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Order on Status Report |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Proposed Order on Status Report |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report Status Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.