Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) case represented by Sarah Margaret Ann Young, against Barbara Dartino, represented by N A, in the jurisdiction of Dolores County, CO, . Dolores County, CO Superior Courts with William Young Furse presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDolores County, CO |
|
Filing Other
Date: July 15, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: September 28, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: July 15, 2022Request - Transcript of Judgment
Date: October 07, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: June 15, 2022Affidavit
Date: July 15, 2022Brief
Date: July 15, 2022Motion for Default Judgment
Date: April 22, 2022Return of Service
Date: November 03, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 15, 2022Certificate
Date: June 24, 2022Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: December 20, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: June 17, 2022Filing Other
Date: July 15, 2022Complaint
Date: February 14, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: June 03, 2022Return Mail
Date: October 07, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 22, 2022Answer
Date: April 22, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: June 24, 2022Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: July 15, 2022Notice
Date: April 29, 2022Motion
Date: July 15, 2022Return Mail
Date: July 25, 2022Notice
Date: July 15, 2022Order(Related Document)
Date: July 18, 2022Order
Date: July 12, 2022Motion(Related Document)
Date: June 15, 2022Affidavit
Date: April 22, 2022Affidavit
Date: April 22, 2022Affidavit
Date: April 20, 2022Summons
Date: February 14, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 14, 2022Return of Service
Date: April 04, 2022Affidavit
Date: April 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Garn - Continuing - Answer | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garn - Exempt w/Levy - Issued(Related Document) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH NOTICE OF EXEMPTION AND PENDING LEVY |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garn - Exempt w/Levy - Proposed(Related Document) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITH NOTICE OF EXEMPTION AND PENDING LEVY |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Request - Transcript of Judgment | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Return Mail | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Return Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.