Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Kelly Mcclellan, Richard Mcclellan Revocable Living Trust, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Keenen D Lovett, against All Unknown Persons Or Entities, represented by Drew Pepper Buffington, in the jurisdiction of Dolores County, CO, . Dolores County, CO Superior Courts with William Young Furse presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2020 |
CategoryRule 105 Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedAugust 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDolores County, CO |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Order(Related Document)
Date: August 11, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: May 13, 2020Filing Other
Date: June 05, 2020Motion
Date: August 10, 2020Motion
Date: February 11, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: August 10, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: July 20, 2020Order
Date: August 06, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: July 24, 2020Motion for Default Judgment
Date: July 20, 2020Filing Other
Date: July 24, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: May 15, 2020Proof of Publication
Date: July 16, 2020Order(Related Document)
Date: February 19, 2020Motion
Date: May 13, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 01, 2020Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: February 13, 2020Affidavit
Date: May 13, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 07, 2020Complaint
Date: February 07, 2020Summons
Date: February 07, 2020Summons
Date: February 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order:Order |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Vacate | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Order |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for WebEx Hearing | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Decree Quieting Title |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filing Other Letter request for certified copy of Decree |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order(Related Document) Decree Quieting Title |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Entry of Judgment and Decree |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.