Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Matt Roane, filed a(n) Other case represented by Matthew H Roane, against Boulder Valley School District Re2, represented by N A, in the jurisdiction of Boulder County, CO, . Boulder County, CO Superior Courts with Andrew Hartman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2022 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBoulder County, CO |
|
Summons - Issued
Date: March 11, 2022Complaint(Related Document)
Date: March 07, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet(Related Document)
Date: March 07, 2022Summons - Proposed(Related Document)
Date: March 07, 2022Waiver of Service
Date: March 16, 2022Notice
Date: April 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissed with Prejudice N/A |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Closed - Dismissed N/A |
|
April 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Acknowledgment and Waiver of Further Service |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons - Issued | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint(Related Document) Complaint |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet(Related Document) Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons - Proposed(Related Document) Summons - Proposed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.