Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Bokf Na, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Brad C Mccollum, in the jurisdiction of Boulder County, CO, . Boulder County, CO Superior Courts with Andrew Hartman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2017 |
CategoryRule 120 Deeds Of Trust Public Trustee |
Last RefreshedJuly 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBoulder County, CO |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: July 11, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: July 11, 2017Motion
Date: October 16, 2017Order(Related Document)
Date: August 07, 2017Proposed Order
Date: October 16, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: July 11, 2017Motion for Order Authorizing Sale(Related Document)
Date: July 11, 2017Order
Date: October 17, 2017Certificate of Posting Rule 120 Notice - Proposed
Date: July 11, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: July 11, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 11, 2017Affidavit
Date: August 02, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: July 11, 2017Proposed Order
Date: July 11, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: July 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing Case Without Prejudice and Vacating Order Authorizing Sale | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissed without Prejudice N/A |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATE ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND VACATING ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order Re: Verified Motion for Order Authorizing Sale |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Closed N/A |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Posting Notice of Rule 120 Hearing | |
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 1 to Motion: Note |
|
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 4 to Motion: SCRA |
|
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc Exhibit 2 to Motion: Deed of Trust |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.