Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garibay, Jennifer, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garibay, Jose Luis, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Respondent's 191 Filed | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Marital Settlement Agreement | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Pet Decl Re: Service of Decl of Disclosure (Prelim) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.