Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Serrano, Jackeline Marlene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Romero, Arturo, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Israels, Valli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsraels, Valli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management157 days |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions448 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration (Respondent) | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Modification | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Enforcement
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Governmental Notice of Motion or Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.