Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Valli K. Israels presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Order- FL-300 | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.