Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arias, Kara Renee, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Lane, Nathan Chance, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2016 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Petition with Minor Children | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Filed Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.