Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Amy Renee Sullivan, Sullivan, Amy Renee, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Halsor, Michael David, Michael David Halsor, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition For Custody And Support |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 31, 2016 | Hearing | Law & Motion | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
May 09, 2016 | Law & Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.