Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Todd, Mia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Todd, Teddy A, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Cassidy, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.