We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Pyramid Tubular Products Llc V. Great Western Petroleum Llc Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago

Pyramid Tubular Products Llc, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Megan Marie Adeyemo, against All Unknown Persons Who Claim Interest, Charter Pipe Llc, Great Western Petroleum Llc, Hyundai Steel Usa Inc, Sdb Trade International Lp, (total of 6) See All represented by Anya Lear, Deva A Solomon, Gabrielle Palmer, Jennifer Carroll Rogers, N A, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Adams County, CO, . Adams County, CO Superior Courts with Sarah Elizabeth Stout presiding.

Case Details for Pyramid Tubular Products Llc v. All Unknown Persons Who Claim Interest , et al.

Judge

Sarah Elizabeth Stout

Filing Date

October 02, 2020

Category

Lien

Last Refreshed

August 16, 2023

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

Adams County, CO

Matter Type

Liens

Parties for Pyramid Tubular Products Llc v. All Unknown Persons Who Claim Interest , et al.

Plaintiffs

Pyramid Tubular Products Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Megan Marie Adeyemo

Defendants

All Unknown Persons Who Claim Interest

Charter Pipe Llc

Great Western Petroleum Llc

Hyundai Steel Usa Inc

Sdb Trade International Lp

Teda Tpco America Corporation

Attorneys for Defendants

Anya Lear

Deva A Solomon

Gabrielle Palmer

Jennifer Carroll Rogers

N A

Paul G Yale

Case Documents for Pyramid Tubular Products Llc v. All Unknown Persons Who Claim Interest , et al.

Notice

Date: October 08, 2020

Notice(Related Document)

Date: January 20, 2021

Waiver of Service

Date: December 04, 2020

Order(Related Document)

Date: January 21, 2021

Order(Related Document)

Date: January 20, 2021

Order

Date: March 18, 2021

Waiver of Service

Date: November 20, 2020

Motion to Dismiss

Date: December 11, 2020

Proposed Order

Date: January 13, 2021

Proposed Order

Date: January 19, 2021

Proposed Order

Date: January 12, 2021

Answer to Crossclaim

Date: January 12, 2021

Answer to Crossclaim

Date: January 13, 2021

Answer to Crossclaim

Date: January 13, 2021

Motion to Dismiss

Date: January 13, 2021

Answer and Counterclaim

Date: December 23, 2020

Answer to Crossclaim

Date: January 13, 2021

Answer

Date: January 18, 2021

Motion(Related Document)

Date: January 04, 2021

Motion to Dismiss

Date: January 12, 2021

Waiver of Service

Date: December 01, 2020

Answer to Counter Claim

Date: January 12, 2021

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Date: December 22, 2020

Motion(Related Document)

Date: January 19, 2021

Answer

Date: November 25, 2020

Waiver of Service

Date: December 04, 2020

Proposed Order

Date: December 11, 2020

Entry of Appearance

Date: December 18, 2020

Entry of Appearance

Date: November 24, 2020

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Date: October 02, 2020

Notice

Date: December 18, 2020

Complaint

Date: October 02, 2020

Filing Other

Date: May 13, 2021

Notice

Date: January 11, 2021

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Date: December 23, 2020

Order(Related Document)

Date: January 04, 2021

Case Events for Pyramid Tubular Products Llc v. All Unknown Persons Who Claim Interest , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event Filing Other
Order Pursuant to CRCP 42.1 (I) from the Supreme Court
Docket Event Order Pursuant to CRCP 42(1)(I)
Docket Event Case Closed
N/A
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Order:Notice of the Order of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Staying Proceedings Pending Consolidation Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 42.1(f)
Docket Event Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Exhibit - The Order of the Panel
Docket Event Notice(Related Document)
Notice of the Order of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Staying Proceedings Pending Consolidation Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 42.1(f)
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Order:Pyramid Tubular Products, LLC's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Great Western Petroleum, LLC/Great Western Operating Company, LLC's Motion To Dismiss
Docket Event Proposed Order
Order Granting Pyramid Tubular Products, LLC's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Great Western Petroleum, LLC/Great Western Operating Company, LLC's Motion To Dismiss
Docket Event Motion(Related Document)
Pyramid Tubular Products, LLC's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Great Western Petroleum, LLC/Great Western Operating Company, LLC's Motion To Dismiss
Docket Event Answer
See all events