We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Lopez-Trevizo, Ludivina V. Lechnir, Kimberly

Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago

Ludivina Lopez-Trevizo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John James Duguay, against Kimberly Lechnir, represented by Matthew Allen Ralston, in the jurisdiction of Adams County, CO, . Adams County, CO Superior Courts with Teri Lynn Vasquez presiding.

Case Details for Ludivina Lopez-Trevizo v. Kimberly Lechnir

Judge

Teri Lynn Vasquez

Filing Date

June 30, 2020

Category

Personal Injury Motor Vehicle

Last Refreshed

June 07, 2023

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

Adams County, CO

Matter Type

Automobile

Parties for Ludivina Lopez-Trevizo v. Kimberly Lechnir

Plaintiffs

Ludivina Lopez-Trevizo

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

John James Duguay

Defendants

Kimberly Lechnir

Attorneys for Defendants

Matthew Allen Ralston

Other Parties

Ludivina Lopez (Aka)

Ludivina Lopeztrevizo (Aka)

Ludivina Trevizo (Aka)

N A (Attorney)

Case Documents for Ludivina Lopez-Trevizo v. Kimberly Lechnir

Substitution of Counsel

Date: November 05, 2020

Answer w/Jury Demand

Date: August 25, 2020

Stipulation

Date: February 18, 2021

Order

Date: August 25, 2020

Order(Related Document)

Date: February 18, 2021

Order

Date: August 18, 2020

Order(Related Document)

Date: October 08, 2020

Complaint w/Jury Demand

Date: June 30, 2020

Notice of Hearing

Date: August 28, 2020

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Date: June 30, 2020

Order

Date: October 06, 2020

Summons

Date: June 30, 2020

Return of Service

Date: July 08, 2020

Order

Date: October 07, 2020

Entry of Appearance

Date: August 10, 2020

Case Events for Ludivina Lopez-Trevizo v. Kimberly Lechnir

Type Description
Docket Event JTRL Dispo - Dismissed
N/A
Docket Event Proposed Order(Related Document)
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice
Docket Event Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice
Docket Event Dismissed with Prejudice
N/A
Docket Event Case Closed
N/A
Docket Event Substitution of Counsel
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Order:Proposed Order - Case Management
Docket Event Minute Order - Print
N/A
Docket Event Proposed Order - Case Management(Related Document)
Proposed Order - Case Management
See all events