We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Mountain States Staffing Inc V. Cornerstone Inc Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago

Mountain States Staffing Inc, filed a(n) Other case represented by Colin James Wilhelm, against Cornerstone Inc, Jacqueline Mclaren, Paul Underwood, Susan Lewis, represented by Benjamin Curtis Whitney, N A, in the jurisdiction of Adams County, CO, . Adams County, CO Superior Courts with Roberto Ramirez presiding.

Case Details for Mountain States Staffing Inc v. Cornerstone Inc , et al.

Judge

Roberto Ramirez

Filing Date

August 06, 2019

Category

Other

Last Refreshed

June 12, 2023

Filing Location

Adams County, CO

Parties for Mountain States Staffing Inc v. Cornerstone Inc , et al.

Plaintiffs

Mountain States Staffing Inc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Colin James Wilhelm

Defendants

Cornerstone Inc

Jacqueline Mclaren

Paul Underwood

Susan Lewis

Attorneys for Defendants

Benjamin Curtis Whitney

N A

Case Documents for Mountain States Staffing Inc v. Cornerstone Inc , et al.

Notice(Related Document)

Date: June 29, 2020

Order(Related Document)

Date: June 18, 2020

Order(Related Document)

Date: November 25, 2019

Proposed Order

Date: August 06, 2020

Motion(Related Document)

Date: June 08, 2020

Motion(Related Document)

Date: June 18, 2020

Order(Related Document)

Date: June 08, 2020

Proposed Order

Date: June 18, 2020

Order(Related Document)

Date: August 31, 2020

Order

Date: June 22, 2020

Return Mail(Related Document)

Date: September 19, 2019

Order(Related Document)

Date: September 06, 2019

Proposed Order

Date: October 07, 2019

Notice of Hearing

Date: October 28, 2019

Motion(Related Document)

Date: October 07, 2019

Answer w/Jury Demand

Date: October 08, 2019

Order(Related Document)

Date: October 08, 2019

Order

Date: October 09, 2019

Return Mail(Related Document)

Date: October 21, 2019

Answer

Date: September 27, 2019

Motion(Related Document)

Date: September 05, 2019

Proposed Order(Related Document)

Date: September 05, 2019

Return of Service

Date: August 22, 2019

Return of Service

Date: August 22, 2019

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Date: August 06, 2019

Order(Related Document)

Date: June 29, 2020

Return of Service

Date: August 22, 2019

Case Events for Mountain States Staffing Inc v. Cornerstone Inc , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event JTRL Dispo - Continued
N/A
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Order: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice
Docket Event Case Closed - Dismissed
N/A
Docket Event Dismissed with Prejudice
N/A
Docket Event Proposed Order
Order
Docket Event Motion to Dismiss(Related Document)
Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice
Docket Event Notice(Related Document)
Notice Of Settlement
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Order: Notice Of Settlement
Docket Event Order
PROCEDURAL ORDER
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Order: Motion UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE RESPONSE TO SUSAN LEWIS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PAUL UNDERWOOD'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, CORNERSTONE INCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT- Granted
See all events