We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Frye, Douglas V. Rivera, Robert

Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago

Douglas Frye, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John Reeves Fuller, against Robert Rivera, represented by Aaron James Long, in the jurisdiction of Adams County, CO, . Adams County, CO Superior Courts with Sarah Elizabeth Stout presiding.

Case Details for Douglas Frye v. Robert Rivera

Judge

Sarah Elizabeth Stout

Filing Date

March 20, 2018

Category

Personal Injury Motor Vehicle

Last Refreshed

August 07, 2023

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

Adams County, CO

Matter Type

Automobile

Parties for Douglas Frye v. Robert Rivera

Plaintiffs

Douglas Frye

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

John Reeves Fuller

Defendants

Robert Rivera

Attorneys for Defendants

Aaron James Long

Case Documents for Douglas Frye v. Robert Rivera

Order(Related Document)

Date: January 30, 2019

Entry of Appearance

Date: July 31, 2018

Order(Related Document)

Date: July 16, 2018

Notice

Date: July 05, 2018

Order(Related Document)

Date: June 06, 2018

Return of Service

Date: May 22, 2018

Motion(Related Document)

Date: May 11, 2018

Motion(Related Document)

Date: June 04, 2018

Complaint

Date: March 20, 2018

Answer w/Jury Demand

Date: June 20, 2018

Proposed Order

Date: May 11, 2018

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Date: March 20, 2018

Summons

Date: May 22, 2018

Order(Related Document)

Date: May 11, 2018

Stipulation

Date: January 29, 2019

Order

Date: June 29, 2018

Case Events for Douglas Frye v. Robert Rivera

Type Description
Docket Event JTRL Dispo - Trial Not Held
N/A
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Order for Dismissal with Prejudice
Docket Event Dismissed with Prejudice
N/A
Docket Event Case Closed
N/A
Docket Event Proposed Order(Related Document)
Order Re Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice
Docket Event Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice
Docket Event Minute Order - Print
N/A
Docket Event Entry of Appearance
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Case Management Order
Docket Event Minute Order - Print
N/A
See all events