We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Ba V. Oberry, David

Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago

The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Ba, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Weldon P Phillips, against David Oberry, represented by N A, in the jurisdiction of Adams County, CO, . Adams County, CO Superior Courts with Teri Lynn Vasquez presiding.

Case Details for The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Ba v. David Oberry

Judge

Teri Lynn Vasquez

Filing Date

September 25, 2017

Category

Rule 120 Deeds Of Trust Public Trustee

Last Refreshed

July 07, 2023

Practice Area

Probate

Filing Location

Adams County, CO

Matter Type

Trusts

Parties for The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Ba v. David Oberry

Plaintiffs

The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Ba

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Weldon P Phillips

Defendants

David Oberry

Attorneys for Defendants

N A

Case Documents for The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Ba v. David Oberry

Affidavit

Date: September 28, 2017

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Date: September 25, 2017

Certificate

Date: September 25, 2017

Order(Related Document)

Date: October 27, 2017

Motion to Dismiss

Date: October 26, 2017

Motion for Order Authorizing Sale

Date: September 25, 2017

Proposed Order

Date: September 25, 2017

Notice of Hearing

Date: September 25, 2017

Case Events for The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Ba v. David Oberry

Type Description
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss
Docket Event Case Closed
N/A
Docket Event Proposed Order(Related Document)
ORDER: MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Docket Event Motion to Dismiss
Docket Event Affidavit
of posting notice 9-27-17
Docket Event Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Exhibit B - Mailing List
Docket Event Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Negotiable Instrument - Deed of Trust
Docket Event Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Negotiable Instrument - Note
Docket Event Civil Case Cover Sheet - 16.1 Does Not Apply
Docket Event Certificate of Mailing and Posting of Notice
See all events