We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Parkins, Mark V. Center At Northridge Llc

Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago

Mark Parkins, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Jeremy Ira Pollack, against Center At Northridge Llc, represented by Andrew C Nickel, in the jurisdiction of Adams County, CO, . Adams County, CO Superior Courts with Teri Lynn Vasquez presiding.

Case Details for Mark Parkins v. Center At Northridge Llc

Judge

Teri Lynn Vasquez

Filing Date

June 15, 2017

Category

Negligence

Last Refreshed

July 07, 2023

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

Adams County, CO

Matter Type

General Negligence

Parties for Mark Parkins v. Center At Northridge Llc

Plaintiffs

Mark Parkins

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Jeremy Ira Pollack

Defendants

Center At Northridge Llc

Attorneys for Defendants

Andrew C Nickel

Case Documents for Mark Parkins v. Center At Northridge Llc

Order

Date: September 22, 2017

Motion(Related Document)

Date: October 05, 2017

Proposed Order

Date: October 05, 2017

Order(Related Document)

Date: November 14, 2017

Order(Related Document)

Date: August 13, 2017

Response(Related Document)

Date: August 15, 2017

Order(Related Document)

Date: September 09, 2017

Stipulation(Related Document)

Date: November 09, 2017

Return of Service

Date: June 30, 2017

Order(Related Document)

Date: October 07, 2017

Notice

Date: September 08, 2017

Proposed Order

Date: September 08, 2017

Order(Related Document)

Date: August 31, 2017

Reply(Related Document)

Date: August 22, 2017

Order

Date: July 27, 2017

Motion(Related Document)

Date: August 04, 2017

Motion(Related Document)

Date: September 08, 2017

Certificate

Date: August 02, 2017

Answer w/Jury Demand

Date: July 21, 2017

Proposed Order

Date: August 04, 2017

Order(Related Document)

Date: July 18, 2017

Proposed Order

Date: July 14, 2017

Motion(Related Document)

Date: July 14, 2017

Complaint w/Jury Demand

Date: June 15, 2017

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Date: June 15, 2017

Proposed Order

Date: January 03, 2018

Order(Related Document)

Date: January 06, 2018

Stipulation(Related Document)

Date: January 03, 2018

Case Events for Mark Parkins v. Center At Northridge Llc

Type Description
Docket Event JTRL Dispo - Trial Not Held
N/A
Docket Event JTRL Dispo - Trial Not Held
N/A
Docket Event Case Closed
N/A
Docket Event Dismissed with Prejudice
N/A
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Order to Dismiss with Prejudice
Docket Event Proposed Order
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice
Docket Event Stipulation(Related Document)
Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice
Docket Event Minute Order - Print
N/A
Docket Event Order(Related Document)
Order: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS
Docket Event Stipulation(Related Document)
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS
See all events