Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Clark, Jasmin Faye Summer, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Hara presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 20, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion Modification
Judge: Torres, Patricia |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Governmental) | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.