Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rogersjackson, Sheressa Denae, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jackson, Paul Deon, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Granted | |
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Disclosure Svc Declaration Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.