Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez, Kenny, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Colin, Yazmin, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Cassidy, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2015 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Hearing with Children | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.